Trustees ONE PERCENT SAFER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1197865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Duncan Sharman Chair 05 October 2020
None on record
Dr Laurie Cure Trustee 17 March 2025
None on record
Evrim Tuncay Trustee 31 August 2023
None on record
Jakob Ogorek Trustee 30 August 2023
None on record
Timothy Mark Eldridge Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Timothy John Walsh Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Louis Joseph Wustemann Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Melissa Mark-Joyce Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record