THE TAFIDA RAQEEB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tafida Raqeeb Foundation is an independent charity committed to bringing about better health and health care for people in the UK and Bangladesh.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 24 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMAD DAHOUD | Chair | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACOB SIMON LYONS | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ABDUL RAQEEB | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALIYA QIDWAI | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £59.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.37k | £63.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH THROUGH RESEARCH INTO IMPROVED DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS BY FUNDING RESEARCH CARRIED OUT IN UNIVERSITIES AND HOSPITAL SETTINGS AND IT IS DISSEMINATED TO THE PUBLIC. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF CHILDREN IN POVERTY IN BANGLADESH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE SERVICES. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RELIEVING SICKNESS BY FUNDING SUPPORT TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS, MAY BE BECAUSE THEIR CURRENT HEALTHCARE TRUST ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE THE TREATMENT REQUIRED AND THEREFORE GETTING TREATMENT REQUIRED MAY INVOLVE ADDITIONAL TRAVEL AND TREATMENT COSTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 PRINCES STRET
MAYFAIR
LONDON
W1B 2LE
- Phone:
- 07932457906
- Email:
- INFO@TR-FOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window