WETHERBY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 July 1987: Standard registration
- 26 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- W E C (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £669 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 07 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 07 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PREACHING THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND TEACHING THE DOCTRINES OF HOLY SCRIPTURE WHICH INCLUDE THE ESSENTIAL DOCTRINES SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULE HERE TO AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) (A) TO UPHOLD CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES OF HONESTY VIRTUE AND INTEGRITY AND TO ENCOURAGE CHRISTIAN PEOPLE IN THEIR FAITH WORSHIP AND CHARITABLE WORKS (B) IN THEIR CHURCH OR ASSEMBLY GATHERINGS TO UPHOLD THE NEW TESTAMENT TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES RELATING TO - (I) THE PRIESTHOOD OF ALL BELIEVERS (II) THE EXERCIES OF SPIRITUAL GIFTS UNDER THE GUIDANCE AND PROMPTING OF THE HOLY SPIRIT (III) THE LEADERSHIP AND PASTORAL CARE OF THE CHURCH BY ELDERS (2) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN WETHERBY AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window