METHWOLD HALL COMPLEX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
From October 14th 2021 Methwold Parish Council became Sole Trustee holding the Properties on trust, for the public benefit, for the benefit of the inhabitants of the civil parish of Methwold and the surrounding area, the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure pursuits of individuals who have need of such facilities, with the object of improving the conditions of life of the inhab
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 14 June 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Methwold Parish Council | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.40k | £26.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.19k | £36.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.33k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF METHWOLD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Parish Office
c/o St George's Hall Complex
16-18 High Street
Methwold
Thetford
Norfolk
- Phone:
- 01366728513
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window