EATING MATTERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association's objects & principal activities are: Provide - in a safe environment - professional, confidential help for people suffering from an eating disorder, including, but not limited to, Anorexia Nervosa, Bulimia Nervosa, Binge Eating Disorder, Other Specified Feeding or Eating Disorders & emotional over-eating. Raise awareness, inform & educate about the effects of eating disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £198,831 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
- 30 January 2024: Funds received from 1003974 EATING MATTERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Waters | Chair | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Harrington | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marrya Ben-Gharbia | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Brown | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN ELIZABETH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Margaret Varley | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £718.34k | £326.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £382.35k | £384.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £146.78k | £198.83k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £569.93k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £146.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £369.62k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION'S OBJECTS AND PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES, IN NORFOLK GENERALLY AND NORWICH IN PARTICULAR, ARE TO: PROVIDE - IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT - PROFESSIONAL, CONFIDENTIAL HELP FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM AN EATING DISORDER, (TO INCLUDE THEIR FAMILY/CARERS WHERE APPROPRIATE), INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA, BINGE EATING DISORDER, OTHER SPECIFIED FEEDING OR EATING DISORDERS AND EMOTIONAL OVER-EATING. EMPOWER USERS OF THE SERVICE TO AID THEIR OWN RECOVERY BY OFFERING REALISTIC CHOICES, PSYCHOEDUCATION AND ONGOING SUPPORT THROUGH COUNSELLING AND GOAL SETTING TO THOSE SUFFERING WITH EATING DISORDERS. PROVIDE SUPPORT WITH THE AIM OF AVOIDING RELAPSE FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM LONG-TERM CHRONIC EATING DISORDERS. RAISE AWARENESS, INFORM AND EDUCATE PEOPLE AND ORGANISATIONS, INCLUDING IN THE EDUCATIONAL SECTOR, ABOUT THE EFFECTS OF EATING DISORDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalk Hill Cottage
19 Rosary Road
Norwich
NR1 1SZ
- Phone:
- 01603665974
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window