ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are one of London's largest unauditioned choral societies with around 300 regular members, offering amateur voices an opportunity to sing a variety of choral works under professional guidance. We welcome anyone who is interested in learning about singing classical choral music, participating in our community and performing with us at concerts in major venues and with professional musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
- 22 November 2022: Funds received from 273180 ST BARTHOLOMEW'S HOSPITAL CHORAL SOCIETY
- BARTS CHOIR (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Susan Shale | Chair | 19 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Jenifer Young | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Vickers | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Le Messurier Adomakoh Andrews | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Harland | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Frank Rowbotham | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stephen Vaughan | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Robert Murphy | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.12k | £252.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.61k | £214.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CIO THROUGH ITS BOARD OF TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (II) TO ADVANCE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY APPLYING ALL OR PART OF THE PROFITS OF THE SAID PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITES BY MAKING DONATIONS TO SUCH OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES, ESPECIALLY THOSE OF A MEDICAL NATURE, AS THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES MAY SELECT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07718536529
- Email:
- chair@bartschoir.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window