DIGIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is dedicated to promoting digital literacy and helping young people develop their digital skills through the lens of activity. We believe that in today's digital age, it is crucial for young people to have the necessary skills to thrive in the digital world. Our activities focus on providing training and resources to support the development of coding and digital literacy activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Peaple | Chair | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Shahneila Saeed FRSA | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Csizmadia BSc MA | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GARRY POULSON | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Panagiota Dimitriadi | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Lange | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Price | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.03k | £441.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.56k | £200.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE) IN TOPICS RELATED TO DIGITAL COMPETENCY INCLUDING CODING AND COMPUTATIONAL THINKING AND BY PROVIDING AND ENABLING ACTIVE EDUCATIONAL AND TECHNOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NARBOROUGH LANE
STANMORE ROAD
EAST ILSLEY
1 Narborough Lane (3rd house down b
Off Old Stanmore Road
RG20 7LX
- Phone:
- 07500005043
- Email:
- info@digitall.charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window