NEVE JEWELS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main objectives are: To enable the employees of Neve Jewels Ltd to support their local charities both in terms of fund raising and the giving of their time. To provide aid and support to a broad spectrum of charities which includes and covers education, welfare, health and various sustainable initiatives to protect and conserve the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 08 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Priyaj Jain | Chair | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Broomfield | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jigar Surendra Mehta | Trustee | 19 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abhishek Jain | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anuj Madhani | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £401.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS THAT WORK TO SUPPORT SUCH PEOPLE; 2. THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS THAT SUPPORT INITIATIVES FOR TREE PLANTING AND THE PROTECTION OF SCARCE NATURAL RESOURCES AND BIODIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEVE JEWELS LTD
7 HATTON GARDEN
LONDON
EC1N 8AD
- Phone:
- 02071383672
- Email:
- foundation@nevejewels.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window