PCD RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the health of children and adults with Primary Ciliary Dyskinesia (PCD) by supporting research into A) Understanding PCD B) Novel therapeutic targets and therapies for PCD C) Advocating for improved standard of care for people with PCD
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Norway
- Portugal
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Harriet Holme | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Florence Barkats | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monica Dawes | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Levene | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gurhan Erturan | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Gehl | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.78k | £40.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £11.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 17 JAN 2022 AMENDED ON 24 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH PRIMARY CILIARY DYSKINESIA (PCD), INVOLVING INHERITED MOTILE OR NON-MOTILE CILIARY DYSFUNCTION. THE CIO WILL CARRY OUT THIS OBJECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY VARIOUS MEANS, INCLUDING: • FUNDING AND SUPPORTING PURE SCIENTIFIC AND APPLIED/TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH TO UNDERSTAND INHERITED CILIARY DYSFUNCTION; • ADVOCATING FOR AN EFFECTIVE CARE REGIME AND THERAPIES FOR PCD; • PROVIDING PATIENT VOICE TO ENSURE THAT RESEARCH AND THERAPEUTICS REFLECT LIVED EXPERIENCES OF PEOPLE WITH PCD; AND • RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT INHERITED CILIOPATHIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008
Contact information
- Address:
-
31A Berrymede Road
LONDON
W4 5JE
- Phone:
- 07920572992
- Email:
- info@pcdresearch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window