Accounts and annual returns HULL HOMELESS AND ROOTLESS PROJECT

Charity number: 519109
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 21 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 18 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 23 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time