QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GIRLS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Be a positive force supporting QEGS students, teachers, and parents, developing strong links between home and school. Encourage and assist the development of parent networks and professional contacts, reaching and utilising a wide range of skill sets. Raise funds to help the school provide extra resources. Run social events for parents and children to get to know each other and have fun
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
Governance
- 17 December 2021: CIO registration
- QEGSA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mara Cavicchia | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Badvie | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirstie Burgin | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £7.65k | £3.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.18k | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN QUEEN ELIZABETH GIRLS' SCHOOL, BARNET (THE SCHOOL) IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 3.1.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEEN ELIZABETHS GIRLS SCHOOL
HIGH STREET
BARNET
EN5 5RR
- Phone:
- 02084492984
- Email:
- qegsa@gapps.qegschool.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window