HOMES IN MIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Charity is established (principally, but not exclusively within the London Borough of Harrow, are: To promote the preservation of good mental health, particularly but not exclusively by: acquiring, holding, leasing, developing, planning, building and managing community led housing. Facilitating the acquisition of such and providing associated facilities, amenities and service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 04 May 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Corinna Weber-Gray | Chair | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
leigh johnstone | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Stephen Bannerman | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leroy Jeffrey Rose | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2024 | 08 January 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2024 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (PRINCIPALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW), ARE: TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. ACQUIRING, HOLDING, LEASING, DEVELOPING, PLANNING, BUILDING, PROVIDING AND MANAGING COMMUNITY-LED HOUSING; 2. FACILITATING THE ACQUISITION, HOLDING, LEASING, DEVELOPING, PLANNING, BUILDING, PROVISION AND MANAGEMENT OF COMMUNITY-LED HOUSING; AND 3. PROVIDING ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, AMENITIES AND SERVICES IN EACH CASE FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE OR WHO MAY HAVE MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o MIND IN HARROW
132-134 COLLEGE ROAD
HARROW
HA1 1BQ
- Phone:
- 02084260929
- Email:
- info@mindinharrow.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window