MEL PRODUCTIONS (MUSIC EDUCATION LANGUAGE PRODUCTIONS) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are for the public benefit of members of the public in the London Borough of Ealing and surrounding areas: 1. To advance education and training of members of the public through the promotion, provision and support of programmes which develop functional and vocational skills and other capabilities 2. To advance the arts, by promoting and facilitating access to equipmen
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 19 December 2022: CIO registration
- MEL PRODUCTIONS (Previous name)
- MEL PRODUCTIONS (MUSIC EDUCATION LANGUAGE PRODUCTIONS) CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yusuf Chadun | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Dublin | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Staples | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREAS: 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS (IN PARTICULAR MUSIC AND AUDIO AND VISUAL MEDIA), CORE CURRICULUM SUBJECTS, VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND BASIC SKILLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MEL Productions CIO
116 Avenue Road
Acton
London
W3 8QG
- Phone:
- 02031051372
- Email:
- mel@melproductions.co.uk
- Website:
-
melproductions.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window