BISHOP P. A. NOEL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Support Education, Alleviate Financial Hardship, and Enhance General Well-being of Grenadians of African and Indo-Caribbean descent residing in Grenada. We support people of African Caribbean descent in the UK and from all Caribbean countries residing in England and Wales. We support communities throughout the Caribbean in times of Natural Disaster and Crises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Grenada
Governance
- 09 March 2022: Standard registration
- Agnita Noel Charity (Working name)
- BISHOP PRISCILDA A. NOEL CHARITY (Working name)
- Mother Noel Charity (Working name)
- Mother Noel Project (Working name)
- Mother P. A. Noel Charity (Working name)
- P. A. Noel Charity (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Watkinson Noel | Chair | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip D Noel | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bonita Benjamin | Trustee | 10 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Dhannie | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.27k | £2.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN REGION AFFECTED [INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID]. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN AND INDO-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THE TRI- 2 ISLAND STATE OF GRENADA, CARRIACOU AND PETITE MARTINIQUE (GRENADA) RESIDING IN THE UK AND GRENADA INCLUDING PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN RESIDING IN THE UK, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 3. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY IN THE UK AND GRENADA WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT UP TO AGE 25 YEARS AT SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 4. TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY PERSONS OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN AND INDO-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THE TRI ISLAND STATE OF GRENADA, CARRIACOU AND PETITE MARTINIQUE (GRENADA) RESIDING IN THE UK AND GRENADA INCLUDING PEOPLE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT FROM THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN RESIDING IN THE UK, UP TO AGE 25 YEARS AT SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY), BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSON’S: A. SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE, OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION INCLUDES THE STUDY OF A STEM, HUMANITIES OR SOCIAL SCIENCES SUBJECT, MEDICINE, LAW OR FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT. B. GRANTS TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 5. TO ASSIST IN RE-ESTABLISHING EDUCATION SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR COMMUNITIES THROUGHOUT THE CARIBBEAN BY PROVIDING RESOURCES IN RESPONSE TO NATURAL DISASTERS AND CRISIS (E.G. THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TEACHING AND LEARNING MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT). 6. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 WHITTON AVENUE EAST
GREENFORD
UB6 0PU
- Phone:
- 07869803879
- Email:
- p.a.noel.charity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window