ANONIMI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance for the benefit of the public education i and appreciation of Classical Music, in particular;ar, Orchestral and chamber music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Latvia
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
Governance
- 20 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GAVENTA | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Stolzenberg | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Pentreath | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF CLASSICAL MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR ORCHESTRAL, CHAMBER, OPERA AND INSTRUMENTAL MUSIC BY: I. THE PRODUCTION OF MUSICAL CONCERTS AND PERFORMANCES WHICH ARE MADE ACCESSIBLE AND AFFORDABLE FOR THE WIDER PUBLIC. II. OUTREACH PROJECTS AND EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS/MASTERCLASSES IN A VARIETY OF VENUES INCLUDING SCHOOLS, RETIREMENT HOMES AND HOSPITALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 GLENARM ROAD
LONDON
UK
E50NA
- Phone:
- +447763066630
- Email:
- info@anonimi.uk
- Website:
-
anonimi.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window