EHSAS E ZINDAGI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Buying and distributing books and stationery, including Islamic books. Providing employment. Providing employees to teach and lead prayers to organisations that can't afford to pay them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 14 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saad Khurshid | Chair | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sohail Murtaza Choudhary | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abrar Hussain | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Amir Rizwan Khan | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.84k | £8.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.34k | £10.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, ESPECIALLY PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY INCLUDING GRANTS TO UNDERPRIVILEGED YOUNG PEOPLE TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATIONAL STUDIES INCLUDING ISLAMIC EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Blaby Close
Sunnyhill
DERBY
DE23 1LY
- Phone:
- 07506682207
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window