WHITLEY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local Whitley branch of the WI, providing education, entertainment,support and a voice for all women. We promote rural initiatives, the environment, and the countryside. We have monthly meetings with a speaker, regular outings, sports and leisure activities. See our website for more information
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Warrington
Governance
- 04 August 1987: Standard registration
- WHITLEY WI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Christine Lynch | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Barber | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Minor | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Waite | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JONES | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.69k | £5.37k | £1.68k | £3.73k | £3.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £5.84k | £1.02k | £3.50k | £4.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WHITLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stockley View
Northwich Road
Higher Whitley
WARRINGTON
WA4 4PH
- Phone:
- 01925730531
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window