BLACK LIVES IN MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We use our data and insight to campaign for equity and support the empowerment of all musicians and professionals to realise their aspirations.We work with organisations, ensembles and companies throughout the UK music industry, opening dialogues and building relationships in the true spirit of working together. We collaborate with all agents of the UK music industry working to achieve equality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£679,850
Donations and legacies | £566.52k | |
Charitable activities | £78.13k | |
Other trading activities | £35.20k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£551,293
Raising funds | £20.00k | |
Charitable activities | £531.29k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £325,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £531.29k | |
Retained for future use | £128.56k |
People

4 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Joseph | Chair | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Janeace Thompson | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Kienda Hoji | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Orphy Robinson | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Moses Oyediwura | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Charisse Beaumont | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.78k | £679.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.50k | £551.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £325.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £566.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £35.20k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £78.13k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £531.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £500 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £2.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £227.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £18.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 OCT 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 4.1.1 ADVANCE THE ARTFORMS OF CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND ALL OTHER FORMS OF MUSIC; 4.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR IN THE CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND WIDER MUSIC INDUSTRY BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT RELATING TO DIVERSITY, INCLUSION AND ANTI-RACISM IN THE MUSIC INDUSTRY TO ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED: I. IN THE PRODUCTION OF CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND/OR OTHER FORMS OF MUSIC; II. IN MUSIC EDUCATION, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION UNIVERSITIES AND CONSERVATORIES (PARTNER ORGANISATIONS); (B) COMMISSIONING RESEARCH AND SURVEYS CONCERNING DIVERSITY AND INCLUSION IN THE MUSIC INDUSTRY, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (C) THE DEVELOPMENT OF DIVERSITY AND INCLUSION TARGETS IN THE MUSIC INDUSTRY, AND THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PARTNER ORGANISATIONS IN ACHIEVING THOSE TARGETS; (D) SUPPORTING, DEVELOPING AND TRAINING ETHNIC MINORITY CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND OTHER MUSICIANS LIVING IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH MENTORING PROGRAMMES, THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES IN ALL ASPECTS OF LIVE MUSIC (INCLUDING TECHNICAL, MANAGEMENT, ADMINISTRATIVE AND PERFORMANCE) AND ASSISTING WITH THE PROCUREMENT OF MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT AND THE DELIVERY OF SUPPORT SESSIONS IN UNIVERSITIES, CONSERVATORIES AND SCHOOLS; (E) PRESENTING PERFORMANCE PROJECTS INVOLVING ETHNIC MINORITY CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND OTHER MUSICIANS; 4.1.3 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ETHNIC MINORITY CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND OTHER MUSICIANS OF LIMITED MEANS LIVING IN THE UK BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL BURSARIES, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION BURSARIES FOR THE PURCHASE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND/OR INSTRUMENTAL LESSONS; 4.1.4 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN MUSIC BY PROVIDING, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR ETHNIC MINORITY MUSICIANS OF ALL AGES, AND ENCOURAGING PROGRAMMES OF CLASSICAL, JAZZ AND OTHER FORMS OF MUSIC WITHIN SCHOOLS; AND 4.1.5 ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES), WHICH ARE COMPLEMENTARY TO THE AFOREMENTIONED PURPOSES, AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HELP MUSICIANS UK
7-11 BRITANNIA STREET
LONDON
WC1X 9JS
- Phone:
- 02070501168
- Email:
- partnership@blim.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window