CADWGAN PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a quality preschool setting providing childcare for up to 16 children per session, operating 2 sessions per day. We are registered as a full day care with CIW. We provide places to children aged 2 to 4 years old. We provide education through the Foundation Phase and deliver through " In the Moment Planning" following the child's lead and seizing opportunities for teaching moments
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £59,375 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Conwy
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA CHAPMAN | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Edwards | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Jones-Miley | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.32k | £112.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.87k | £87.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £90.19k | £59.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL BABANOD T GWYNN JONES
LLANELIAN ROAD
OLD COLWYN
COLWYN BAY
LL29 9UA
- Phone:
- 01792532337
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window