THE WEATHERLEY CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities (namely The Weatherley Centre) in the interest of social welfare for sports capable of improving physical health and fitness, recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents of Biggleswade. The provisions of grants to other organisations that facilitate the above objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 11 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Ian Stewart | Chair | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Donna Joyce Lincoln | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Matthew Pullinger | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Andrew George Leftwich | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Elstone | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Faraz Ahmed Bhatti | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 August 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 September 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE PEOPLE OF BIGGLESWADE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEATHERLEY CENTRE
EAGLE FARM ROAD
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 8JH
- Phone:
- 01767315709
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window