EAST VALE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EAST VALE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT OPERATES TWO WHEELCHAIR-FRIENDLY MINIBUSES ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS. MEMBERSHIP OF THE SCHEME IS OPEN TO ANY ORGANISATION OR INDIVIDUAL WITHIN THE EASTERN VALE OF GLAMORGAN,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £13,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 August 1987: Standard registration
- EVCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Geoffrey Blenkinsop | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Stoker | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick O'Neill | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Weston | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Gibbins | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS MORGAN | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.35k | £27.11k | £16.44k | £4.02k | £29.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.50k | £19.22k | £14.33k | £20.53k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.08k | £16.01k | N/A | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 1994 & 19 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF AND TO RUN AND MAINTAIN COMMUNITY TRANSPORT BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITIES OF THE EASTERN VALE OF GLAMORGAN. 2. THE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT WILL BE AVAILABLE TO ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY WITH PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO OLDER AND DISABLED PEOPLE. IN THIS CONTEXT THE TERM OLD REFERS TO ANYONE OVER THE AGE OF 60 YEARS.
Area of benefit
THE EASTERN VALE OF GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 6 Penarth Methodist Church
Woodland Place
PENARTH
South Glamorgan
CF64 2EX
- Phone:
- 02920705138
- Email:
- eastvalect@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window