WALKCYCLEPLAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID COX | Chair |
|
||||||
Tharuman Shivaji Shivapadasundaram | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sandra Green | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THE WEST MIDLANDS, BY PROMOTING WALKING, CYCLING AND PLAY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 3.1.1 ADVOCATING AND CAMPAIGNING ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ACTIVE TRAVEL AND PHYSICAL RECREATION; 3.1.2 ENCOURAGING AND ENABLING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR AGE, ABILITY, GENDER, RACE, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, TO CYCLE, WALK OR ENGAGE IN ACTIVE PLAY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE FACILITIES, SERVICES, TRAINING, AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; 3.1.3 PROMOTING HEALTHY RECREATION AND PUBLIC SAFETY PARTICULARLY ON HIGHWAYS; AND 3.1.4 EDUCATING AND RAISING THE AWARENESS OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ISSUES RELATING TO WALKING, CYCLING AND PLAY AND THEIR IMPACT ON HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o VWV LLP (Ref: SWS)
Second Floor Baskerville House
3 Brindley Place
Birmingham
B1 2JB
- Phone:
- 07867366974
- Email:
- sshiva@vwv.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window