MADINAH ACADEMY COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance teaching of Islamic Faith and Principles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 14 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Umar Pandor | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Farid Ahmad Timol | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zubair Seedat | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ilyas Akujee | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 July 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 24 July 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING LESSONS ON READING AND UNDERSTANDING THE HOLY QURAN, UNDERSTANDING ISLAMIC PRINCIPLES, AND PRACTICING THE FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 SHREWSBURY STREET
MANCHESTER
M16 7NY
- Phone:
- 077895176575
- Email:
- u_pandor77@hotmsail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window