Trustees NATIONAL POETRY CENTRE
Charity number: 1200861

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH ANGELA PITT | Chair | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Maria Pitter | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ann Maxfield | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elisabeth Madeley | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Gladish | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Bearpark | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Masud Khokhar | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pervinder Kaur | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert Armitage | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.