Accounts and annual returns ELEPHANT GIN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1198715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 January 2025 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 January 2025 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 November 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 February 2024 111 days late Download Open in new window