FRODSHAM DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity number: 519150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Runs Rainbows, Brownies and Girl Guides

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £2,540
Total expenditure: £3,533

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRODSHAM DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICOLA BARKER Trustee
CHESHIRE FOREST COUNTY OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MARGARET ANN BRITLAND Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.98k £1.71k £285 £2.10k £2.54k
Total expenditure £9.82k £2.67k £2.72k £2.95k £3.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
White Lodge
Depmore Lane
FRODSHAM
WA6 6UD
Phone:
07720632161
Website:

No information available