THE CAT AND RABBIT RESCUE CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taking in unwanted, abandoned or stray animals and giving them a good quality of life until it is possible to find a loving, permanent home for them. We educate the public in responsible pet ownership to eliminate indiscriminate breeding by encouraging the neutering of all pets, including pedigrees. We advise and help the public in the humane control of feral cats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
- THE CAT AND RABBIT RESCUE, THE CAT AND RABBIT, CRRC, CAT AND RABBIT, CAT & RABBIT, THE CAT & RABBIT RESCUE, THE CAT & RABBIT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Beryl Rafter | Chair | 17 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Janet Laws | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Deborah Mary Rayner | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS, RABBITS AND ANIMALS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF ABANDONMENT, MISTREATMENT, SICKNESS OR OTHERWISE IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (1) PROVIDING OR MAINTAINING SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION INCLUDING HOSPITALS AND OTHER FACILITIES (2) ADVISING AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC CONCERNING RESPONSIBLE PET OWNERSHIP AND THE HUMANE CONTROL OF FERAL CATS THROUGH THE ELIMINATION OF INDISCRIMINATE BREEDING BY ENCOURAGING THE NEUTERING OF ALL PETS INCLUDING PEDIGREES IN ALL CASES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLBOROW LODGE
CHALDER LANE
SIDLESHAM
CHICHESTER
WEST SUSSEX
PO20 7RJ
- Phone:
- 01243967111
- Email:
- info@crrc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window