SOUTHAMPTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southampton Sight supports people with sight loss or at risk of sight loss to remain independent. We do this by delivering services that support people to have greater independence, experience reduced isolation, achieve their own individual goals and to have greater access to sight loss resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £44,582 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 07 December 2021: CIO registration
- 19 May 2022: Funds received from 255718 SOUTHAMPTON SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
- SOUTHAMPTON SIGHT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Russell Fair | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Victoria Dowling | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lieke Dorine Van Putten | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Chivers | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Abdoush | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Mark Boswell | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Marson | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS KENNETH MCINULTY | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.79k | £225.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.11k | £239.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £44.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH HEARING LOSS IN SOUTHAMPTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THEIR NEEDS AND ASPIRATIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTHAMPTON SIGHT
3A BASSETT AVENUE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 7DP
- Phone:
- 02380769882
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window