HUNSTANTON AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE 615 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for local good causes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 31 March 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Napolitano | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brown | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jack Napolitano | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Darby | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.50k | £38.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.29k | £41.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 February 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND & WALES AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE OR SELECT. THE CLUB SHALL COMMUNICATE SUCH DETERMINATION OR SELECTION TO THE TRUSTEES IN WRITING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heacham Manor
HUNSTANTON ROAD
HEACHAM
KING'S LYNN
PE31 7JX
- Phone:
- 07568138331
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window