EMPOWERMENT LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual showcase events: To allow ethnic minorities of all ages to present to the public a choice of performing art. Workshops: Brought by qualified professionals. Workshops include but are not limited to finical advice, photography, and business sharing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Wellington | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debonico Aleski Brandy-Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Wellington | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ansa | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £6.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £1.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 April 2025 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2024 | 322 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF DANCING, SINGING & POETRY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TUITION AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES FOR ETHNIC MINORITIES (AS DEFINED BY THE UK GOVERNMENT) ON A FAMILY INCOME OF LESS THAN ?26,000 PER ANNUM. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 LUFFMAN ROAD
LONDON
SE12 9SX
- Phone:
- 07581034851
- Email:
- jjwigwham@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window