ST MICHAEL'S CENTRE PARTNERSHIP BYKER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission is to work with the people of Byker and partner organizations to empower young people and the Community to lead positive and fulfilling lives. We will do this be developing and operating a Youth and Community hub from St Michael's Church in Byker offering facilities and services that support the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£834,555
Donations and legacies | £834.56k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£112,410
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other | £112.41k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £684,555 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £112.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £722.15k |
People

1 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 10 February 2022: CIO registration
- THE LIGHTHOUSE PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip James Anthony Medley | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Campbell | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Jamie Martin | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Christopher Ross | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Russell | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stacey Davidson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ISABELLA MAY MCDONALD-BOOTH | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Topacho | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev JOHN ERNEST SADLER | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Mark Squires | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.02k | £834.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.00k | £112.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £151.02k | £684.56k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £834.56k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £112.41k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £603.63k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £545.59k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £385.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1)TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, IN PARTICULAR THE EAST END OF THE CITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME IN OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH; IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: (2)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND TO MANAGE SUCH AS A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Martins Centre
Roman Avenue
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 2RJ
- Phone:
- 07735990077
- Email:
- ben@lighthousebyker.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window