OWTON FENS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation maintains a grass roots commitment whilst attempting the instigation of new and sometimes ambitious projects to achieve sustainable regeneration, and recognises that to fulfil its vision, working in partnership with other organisations and agencies is the key to unlocking a communities potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 25 August 1987: Standard registration
- 20 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.91k | £160.57k | £142.39k | £64.41k | £76.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.67k | £171.94k | £162.25k | £70.57k | £71.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £5.59k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 July 2018 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 31 July 2018 | 181 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 18 July 2017 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
18 July 2017 | 168 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 08 March 2016 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 12 May 2016 | 102 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 15TH DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF TH HABITANTS OF THE SOUTH WEST AREA AND OTHER SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED ESTATES THROUGHOUT HARTLEPOOL AND THE SUB-REGION OF TEESVALLEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL AND SUB-REGION OF TEES VALLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window