THE BASE GREENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Base opened in February 2019 in partnership with Greenham Trust and Corn Exchange Newbury Trust. A purpose built visual arts and craft venue, comprising a 110sqm gallery, 8 artist studios and a workshop space for participatory classes. We present a varied programme of touring exhibitions alongside work from local artists and a number of visual arts and craft courses and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 06 June 2022: Standard registration
- THE BASE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN STARK | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh Dockley | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Willoughby | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £272.64k | £299.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.15k | £310.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £963 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF VISUAL ARTS AND CRAFT, BY ENGAGING PEOPLE IN A MEANINGFUL WAY THAT WILL ENHANCE THEIR LIVES THROUGH EXHIBITIONS AND CREATIVE WORKSHOPS, WORKING WITH COMMUNITIES PRIMARILY BASED IN WEST BERKSHIRE AND NORTH HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Base
GREENHAM BUSINESS PARK
Communications Road
THATCHAM
RG19 6HN
- Phone:
- 01635 582 666
- Email:
- admin@thebasegreenham.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window