BROMYARD BOWMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bromyard Bowmen provides, both indoor and outdoor, facilities for the benefit of the inhabitants of Bromyard and surrounding areas enabling them to take part in Archery. Courses in Archery are held each year for beginners, schools, youth organisations and organisations caring for mentally and physically disabled adults and children, as well as socially disadvantaged children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 13 June 2022: CIO registration
- 21 August 2024: Funds received from 1101847 BROMYARD BOWMEN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil White | Chair | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Warren | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Moor | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Catterall | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Baggs | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Lovell | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel O'Connor | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS IN BROMYARD, HEREFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR TAKING PART IN ARCHERY IN ALL ITS FORMS EXCEPT CROSS BOW AND BOW HUNTING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CLIVE RICHARDS SPORTS GROUND
BROMYARD
HR7 4LP
- Phone:
- 07578131212
- Email:
- bromyardbowmen@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window