SUPPORTING SUNNI SCHOLARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE SEEK TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO IMAMS AND SCHOLARS, ESPECIALLY FROM LOW-INCOME BACKGROUNDS, TO SPREAD THE PRINCIPLES OF ISLAM THROUGH PUBLISHING AND TEACHING, RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, AND CARRY OUT OUTREACH WORK. DONATIONS FROM THE PUBLIC ARE USED TO FUND SCHOLARS WHO CAN BE IN A BETTER POSITION TO GIVE BACK TO THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Algeria
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- India
- Italy
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Mauritania
- Morocco
- Pakistan
- Saudi Arabia
- Somalia
- Spain
- Turkey
- Uzbekistan
- Yemen
Governance
- 30 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hamzah Mahmood | Chair | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD IFZAL QAMAR | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mubashir Hussain Mahmood | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £558 | £66.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £62.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE TRADITIONAL SUNNI ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, BY FINANCIALLY SUPPORTING IMAMS AND SCHOLARS, ESPECIALLY FROM LOW-INCOME BACKGROUNDS, TO SPREAD THE PRINCIPLES OF ISLAM THROUGH PUBLISHING AND TEACHING, RAISE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS AND PRACTICES, AND CARRY OUT OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Supporting Sunni Scholars
5A-5B Mackenzie Street
SLOUGH
SL1 1XQ
- Phone:
- 01753316181
- Website:
-
supportingsunnischolars.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window