FRIENDS OF THE GLAMORGAN HERITAGE COAST PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the activity of the Glamorgan Heritage Coast Project in conserving the natural beauty of the environment and providing amenities for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 21 August 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carys Stallard | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Louise Schup | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Powell | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.21k | £893 | £429 | £362 | £713 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.91k | £526 | £214 | £1.15k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2023 as amended on 05 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST ALONG THE COASTLINE OF THE GLAMORGAN HERITAGE COAST, PROVIDED THAT THE WORKS OF THE SOCIETY ARE LIMITED TO LAND OVER WHICH PUBLIC ACCESS IS ASSURED.
Area of benefit
COASTLINES OF SOUTH, WEST AND MID GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Purlon Farm
Wick Road
LLANTWIT MAJOR
South Glamorgan
CF61 1YU
- Phone:
- 07968496178
- Email:
- dave.purlon@gmail.com
- Website:
-
no.website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window