ASHWELLS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants as determined by its trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Walther | Chair | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Grant Kirkby | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WALTHER | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494.03k | £47.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.20k | £41.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, BY PROVIDING GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHWELLS BARN
CHESHAM LANE
CHALFONT ST. GILES
HP8 4AS
- Phone:
- 07952907785
- Email:
- ashwells13@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window