TERRAVERDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to further such charitable purposes according to the law of England and Wales as the trustees see fit from time to time. In particular, to promote for the benefit of the public the promotion of the protection of the environment by providing grants to organisations and projects focusing on the conservation, protection and improvement of the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Algeria
- Antarctica
- Argentina
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Chile
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Greenland
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Kosovo
- Latvia
- Lesotho
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Armitage | Chair | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karl Coppack | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick O'Sullivan | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £58.90k | £75.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £5.57k | £122.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2024 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. IN PARTICULAR, TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROMOTION OF THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS AND PROJECTS FOCUSING ON THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Terraverde
288 Bishopsgate
LONDON
EC2M 4QP
- Phone:
- 07816448861
- Email:
- admin@terraverde.org
- Website:
-
terraverde.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window