BEARTOWN RICKSHAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To increase the mental health and well-being of residents who for whatever reason have limited mobility by offering free rides on a rickshaw and going to car free spaces such as Astbury Mere, Congleton Park and Biddulph Valley Way
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 26 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Howard Chapman | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Wilfred Matthews Wardle | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Bolding | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Anthony Hall | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Philip Bolding | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jill Dooney | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.68k | £15.64k | £6.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.41k | £6.43k | £3.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR THOSE IN CONGLETON, CHESHIRE, IN NEED BY REASON OF SOCIAL ISOLATION, LIMITED MOBILITY, AGE, DISABILITY, INFIRMITY, FRAILTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ANY OTHER DISADVANTAGE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEER-LED RICKSHAW RIDES THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO FEEL THE WIND IN THEIR HAIR AND PROVIDE SOME MENTAL HEALTH BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MANOR CLOSE
CONGLETON
CW12 3LB
- Phone:
- 07927969196
- Email:
- info@btrickshaw.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window