LEWES LOW COST COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1202190
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a not for profit service available to all members of the community in the Lewes area on a low income. We provide affordable, good quality counselling. We believe that everyone who would like to have counselling should be able to access it.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2023: CIO registration
  • 04 December 2023: Funds received from 1168967 LEWES LOW COST COUNSELLING SERVICE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Colin Andrew Hartland Chair 30 September 2019
None on record
dr PETER HAYDN SMITH Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Dr Samuel Charles Berens Trustee 29 November 2022
None on record
Waclawa Marta Baginska Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
GERALDINE PASS Trustee 01 August 2012
None on record
Violet Elizabeth Woodhead Trustee 01 August 2012
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
66, High Street
Lewes
BN7 1XG
Phone:
07445509825