Financial history 1st Nuneaton (Attleborough) Scout Group

Charity number: 519200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.46k £15.75k £16.64k £23.78k £27.89k
Total expenditure £23.44k £16.62k £19.20k £26.25k £27.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £14.43k N/A N/A N/A