DALI DOG RESCUE UK

Charity Number: 1198532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the suffering of dogs in Cyprus who are abandoned, stray or otherwise in need of care and attention, and which may be at risk of being euthanised, in particular, but not exclusively by: Assisting in the reception, treatment and care of such dogs. Providing or assisting in the provision of the rehoming of such dogs once they reach the UK

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £154,649
Total expenditure: £147,365

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Cyprus
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 April 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Jayne Portman Chair 01 July 2022
None on record
Brigitte Ann South Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Kyriacos Spyrou Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Mackenzie Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £145.39k £154.65k
Total expenditure £145.80k £147.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
49 Station Road
Polegate
East Sussex
BN26 6EA
Phone:
07765225292