MOUNT ST MARY'S COLLEGE CENTENARY FURTHER EDUCATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of any former pupil of Mount St Mary's College, Spinkhill, Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 27 August 1987: Standard registration
- MOUNT ST MARY'S COLLEGE CENTENARY SCHOLARSHIP FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUZANNAH CAROLINE WALKER BSC | Chair | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jayne Davis | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LIAM RYDER PAGE | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
BYRON JAMES MASSARELLA | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SEAN THOMAS PAGE | Trustee | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lynda Pauline Merrick | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.53k | £46.68k | £5.96k | £7.71k | £9.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.33k | £17.08k | £7.04k | £5.78k | £10.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE SCHEME DATED THE 4TH JANUARY 2002, WILL GOVERN THE CHARITY AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ANY FORMER PUPIL OF MOUNT ST MARY'S COLLEGE BY THE PROVISION OF AWARDS TO ASSIST THEM IN THEIR STUDY AT ANY UNIVERSITY , SCHOOL, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTE OF HIGHER LEARNING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, OR IN TAKING PART IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITY INTENDED TO DEVELOP THE FURTHER EDUCATION OF ANY SUCH PUPIL INCLUDING TRAVEL, ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER EXPENSE ANCILLARY TO SUCH STUDY WHICH SHALL BE DEEMED BY THE TRUSTEES TO BE NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE FOR THE PROMOTION OF SUCH STUDIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Pantycelyn Place
St. Athan
BARRY
South Glamorgan
CF62 4PS
- Phone:
- 01246 268960
- Email:
- info@centenaryfund.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window