THE STEPHANIE JEANNE GLYNN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation makes grants to charities that are focused on helping young people under the age of twenty nine, particularly in relation to: - Improving child patient care, experience, and environment - Funding research into better treatments for childhood diseases - Support for children suffering from extreme financial hardship - Education and training for children to pursue their goals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 2022: CIO registration
- WITH LOVE, STEPH (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR GLYNN | Chair | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Yeates | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE-MARIE FOX | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GLYNN | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.09k | £40.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.36k | £37.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ADVANCING THE HEALTH AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 READING DRIVE
SALE
M33 5DL
- Phone:
- 07799665895
- Email:
- HELLO@WITHLOVESTEPH.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.WITHLOVESTEPH.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window