MRI SOFTWARE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a grant-making charity providing grants to those outlined in the grant making policy and any other cause which is charitable under English law and which furthers the Charity's objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Yanchar | Chair | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elena Sophie Cooper | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Briody | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.29k | £34.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.41k | £20.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
M R I SOFTWARE
ENERGY HOUSE
9 KING STREET
LONDON
EC2V 8EA
- Phone:
- 02038617100
- Email:
- foundation@mrisoftware.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window