TAK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making charitable grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Katten | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Tamar Anne Katten | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rafi Simcha Katten | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.10k | £149.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £6.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS, IN PARTICULAR: A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY. B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, SICKNESS, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. D) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING WITH THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF COMMUNITY PROJECTS AND CHARITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 TENTERDEN DRIVE
LONDON
NW4 1EE
- Phone:
- 07732338837
- Email:
- Adam.Katten@nlpfm.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window