Accounts and annual returns THE SPACE CENTRE PRESTON LTD

Charity Number: 519208
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2013 15 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 01 April 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2012 29 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 02 September 2013 2 days late