Financial history HULL WOMEN'S CENTRE

Charity number: 519212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £23.22k £6.72k £12.84k £8.09k £8.08k
Total expenditure £17.22k £6.57k £13.43k £12.66k £12.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.50k N/A N/A