THE MECHANICS CENTRE MUSEUM OF LABOUR AND TRADES UNION HISTORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charities objects are to advance the education of the public including advancing its knowledge of the origins,growth and development of the Labour and Trades Union movements and promoting an understanding of the contribution made by the Manchester Mechanics Insitute to the education of young people in the application of science to mechanical and manufacturing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 02 September 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRY SPOONER | Chair |
|
||||||
JOHN NICHOLSON | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Stott | Trustee | 10 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Lilian Sheehy | Trustee | 10 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Morgan | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annette Patricia Wright | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rigby | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CARL ANTHONY WEBB | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MANNING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERENCE STUART MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN WILLIAM MCDONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN MORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DODD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
||||||
GERALD COONEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES MATTHEW MCNICHOLLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.39k | £3.63k | £5.06k | £3.74k | £28.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.41k | £37.72k | £12.88k | £17.88k | £24.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR A MUSEUM, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING ADVANCING ITS KNOWLEDGE OF THE ORIGINS, GROWTH AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE LABOUR AND TRADES UNION MOVEMENTS AND PROMOTING AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE CONTRIBUTION MADE BY THE MANCHESTER MECHANICS INSTITUTE (WHICH OCCUPIED 103 PRINCESS ST, MANCHESTER FROM 1856 TO 1882) TO THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEN IN THE APPLICATIONOF SCIENCE TO MECHANICAL AND MANUFACTURING ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MECHANICS CENTRE LTD
103 PRINCESS STREET
MANCHESTER
M1 6DD
- Phone:
- 01618604067
- Email:
- jim@cwu-gmr.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window