ASTON MANOR ROAD TRANSPORT MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A display of commercial road transport vehicles, mainly buses, together with transport related ephemera, mostly of local interest. Open at weekends and Tuesdays throughout the year, run by volunteers only. Parties can be catered for at other times by advance booking. For educational purposes relevant to pupils studying within key stage 1 & 2. Free bus services run on a limited number of days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 02 September 1987: Standard registration
- ASTON MANOR TRANSPORT MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN JOHN FISHER B TECH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David John Goodwin | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John William Beech | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blythe Beattie | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY PELHAM ADKINS | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENRY GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN LEONARD BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.55k | £85.16k | £89.00k | £34.63k | £51.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.13k | £45.81k | £60.53k | £62.74k | £68.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | £50.25k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 06 OCTOBER 1999. as amended on 11 Apr 2017 as amended on 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Company is established are:- (a) To advance public education by establishing and maintaining for the benefit of the nation a permanent display of historic commercial vehicles within or adjacent to the area of the West Midlands Combined Authority and for the like purpose to promote the permanent preservation of all historic commercial vehicles and equipment, and items of general transport interest of actual or potential historic or scientific importance and educative value.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Baxter Court
96 School Road
Moseley
BIRMINGHAM
- Phone:
- 01214494606
- Email:
- amrtm1@aol.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window